THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:51:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Mejia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Mejia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Aug 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1999