THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:44:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rome, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 799 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 6565
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 625 runnymede rd
Toronto Ontario M6S 3A3
Phone: 4167627316
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 2000 east Office
55 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 3L2
Phone: (416) 849-5555
Fax: (416) 849-5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Runnymede Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2021

Corporation Name: Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Rome, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 799 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6G 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 6565
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 625 runnymede rd
Toronto Ontario M6S 3A3
Phone: 4167627316
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 2000 east Office
55 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 3L2
Phone: (416) 849-5555
Fax: (416) 849-5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Runnymede Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2021

Corporation Name: Varlese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIO VARLESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARLESE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIO VARLESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARLESE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rome, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Dec 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 1999