THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
809 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 197 Third Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
Phone: 905 373-1227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 764 Baker Crescent
Kingston Ontario K7M 6P6
Phone: 613 389-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Victoria St S
Unit B
Ground Floor
Kitchener ON N2G 2B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1054 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3K 1G6
Phone: 416-746-3012
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2
Phone: 905 338-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
809 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 197 Third Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 3L5
Phone: 905 373-1227
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 764 Baker Crescent
Kingston Ontario K7M 6P6
Phone: 613 389-4400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Victoria St S
Unit B
Ground Floor
Kitchener ON N2G 2B3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1054 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3K 1G6
Phone: 416-746-3012
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2
Phone: 905 338-3331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKASH DEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKASH DEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2000