THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Division of Vascular Surgery, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of London, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Division of Vascular Surgery, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2000