THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:57:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2000