THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:56:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kotecha, Shauna Ashok (Used Until: 11 Aug 2003)
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 8E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-785-3627
Fax: 905-785-3628
Address: 2951 Walker's Line, main floor
Wharton Medical clinic
Mississauga Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 905 592-2301
Fax: 905 592-2302

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shauna Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2011

General Information

Former Name: Kotecha, Shauna Ashok (Used Until: 11 Aug 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Argentia Rd
Mississauga ON L5N 8E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-785-3627
Fax: 905-785-3628
Address: 2951 Walker's Line, main floor
Wharton Medical clinic
Mississauga Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: 905 592-2301
Fax: 905 592-2302

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shauna Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUNA ASHOK JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUNA ASHOK JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2000