THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:33:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: United Arab Emirates University, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
02 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
23 Sep 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
University of Ottawa
PEAP - R - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 02 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2009 to 01 Nov 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2008 to 22 Sep 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2000