THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clnique ophtalmologique decarie
587 Decarie
Montreal Quebec H4L 3L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 747-6111
Fax: (514) 956-8628
Address: Westmount Aesthetic Cosmetic Surger
245 victoria ave suite 300
montreal Quebec H3Z 2M6
Phone: (514) 488-0163
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CHUM
1051 rue sanguinet
Montreal, Qc
H2X3E4
montreal Quebec H2L 4M1
Phone: (514) 890-8278
Fax: (514)412-7761
Address: Victoria Park West Island
6500 Transcanadienne Ouest
Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 0A5
Phone: (514) 488-8668
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clnique ophtalmologique decarie
587 Decarie
Montreal Quebec H4L 3L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 747-6111
Fax: (514) 956-8628
Address: Westmount Aesthetic Cosmetic Surger
245 victoria ave suite 300
montreal Quebec H3Z 2M6
Phone: (514) 488-0163
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CHUM
1051 rue sanguinet
Montreal, Qc
H2X3E4
montreal Quebec H2L 4M1
Phone: (514) 890-8278
Fax: (514)412-7761
Address: Victoria Park West Island
6500 Transcanadienne Ouest
Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 0A5
Phone: (514) 488-8668
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIE MARIE KHOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIE MARIE KHOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2000