THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
DATE: 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000