THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:48:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-0653
Fax: (895) 828-0765

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahamas
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-0653
Fax: (895) 828-0765

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahamas
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANDREW FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANDREW FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000