THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:19:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Quinn, Dana Lynn (Used Until: 13 Dec 2022) McKay, Dana Lynn (Used Until: 07 Sep 2006)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King St
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener and Waterloo Site
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-742-3611
Extension: 2242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Oct 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: Quinn, Dana Lynn (Used Until: 13 Dec 2022) McKay, Dana Lynn (Used Until: 07 Sep 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King St
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener and Waterloo Site
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-742-3611
Extension: 2242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Oct 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANA LYNN MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANA LYNN MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000