THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:28:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000