THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 70
28 St John Street
Merrickville Ontario K0G 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 269-2970
Fax: (613) 269-4194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 70
28 St John Street
Merrickville Ontario K0G 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 269-2970
Fax: (613) 269-4194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENELOPE KATHRYN MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PENELOPE KATHRYN MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000