THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:40:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavillion 8-325
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5224
Fax: (416) 603-5991
Address: Toronto General Hospital
10EN-217
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3573
Fax: 416-340-3808
Address: Women's College Hospital
Suite 8333
76 Grenville street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7712
Fax: 416-323-7710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A Okrainec and J Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavillion 8-325
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5224
Fax: (416) 603-5991
Address: Toronto General Hospital
10EN-217
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3573
Fax: 416-340-3808
Address: Women's College Hospital
Suite 8333
76 Grenville street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7712
Fax: 416-323-7710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A Okrainec and J Huber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN ERIC PETER PHILIP OKRAINEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKRAINEC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN ERIC PETER PHILIP OKRAINEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKRAINEC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000