THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RA KYUNG HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RA KYUNG HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000