THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:12:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Soni, Shilpa (Used Until: 11 Jul 2002)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 290 Lakeshore Road East
Madill Health Aid Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058421181
Fax: 9053371423

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Soni, Shilpa (Used Until: 11 Jul 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 290 Lakeshore Road East
Madill Health Aid Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058421181
Fax: 9053371423

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHILPA MADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHILPA MADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000