THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
12 Upjohn Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-0412
Fax: (647) 350-0417

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Unarket Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
12 Upjohn Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-0412
Fax: (647) 350-0417

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Unarket Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAN UNARKET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNARKET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAN UNARKET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNARKET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000