THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunridge Professional Building
Suite 505
2675 36 Street Northeast
Calgary Alberta T1Y 6H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 452-6384
Fax: (403) 452-6418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 14 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunridge Professional Building
Suite 505
2675 36 Street Northeast
Calgary Alberta T1Y 6H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 452-6384
Fax: (403) 452-6418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 14 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAGDISH RAI ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAGDISH RAI ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000