THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:12:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Inner Mongolia Medical College, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Inner Mongolia Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Inner Mongolia Medical College, 1982
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000