THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000