THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:46:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000