THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:06:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1993
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000