THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 19:45:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: Khulbe, Suman Skye (Used Until: 19 Dec 2001)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Karma Wellness
5 Windgate Crescent
K2M-2X8
Kanata Ontario K2M 2X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 614-3825
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suman Khulbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khulbe (CPSO#: 75449 )
Business Address: 5 Windgate Crescent
Kanata Ontario K2M 2X8
(613) 614-3825

General Information

Former Name: Khulbe, Suman Skye (Used Until: 19 Dec 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Karma Wellness
5 Windgate Crescent
K2M-2X8
Kanata Ontario K2M 2X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 614-3825
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suman Khulbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khulbe (CPSO#: 75449 )
Business Address: 5 Windgate Crescent
Kanata Ontario K2M 2X8
(613) 614-3825

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMAN KHULBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHULBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMAN KHULBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHULBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 01 Jun 2023
Hearing Date(s): Motion; March 04, 05, 06 & April 02, 2024. Motion; Sept 13, 2024 (hearing in writing). Merits; May 5, 6, 7, 8, 12, 13, June 2, 3, 4, 6, 16, 17, 20, 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Khulbe’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.  It is alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to a patient by engaging in a sexual relationship with the patient, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries including in her conduct and communications, and inappropriately administering medication and/or other substances and/or inappropriately providing the patient with medication and/or other substances, and having the patient inappropriately administer medication and/or substances to her.  In addition, it is also alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to patients including by, but not limited to, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients, including in her conduct and communications, inappropriately administering medications and/or other substances to patients, and inappropriately disclosing personal health information. In addition, it is also alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including, but not limited to, by failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients including by hosting social gatherings and/or parties at her medical practice, that patients attended; consuming alcohol with and/or in the presence of patients; and inappropriately administering medication and/or other substances to others and to herself and/or having others inappropriately administer to her.    
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Discipline referral to OPSDT
Date of Referral or Application: 01 Jun 2023
Hearing Date(s): Motion; March 04, 05, 06 & April 02, 2024. Motion; Sept 13, 2024 (hearing in writing). Merits; May 5, 6, 7, 8, 12, 13, June 2, 3, 4, 6, 16, 17, 20, 2025
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Khulbe’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.  It is alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to a patient by engaging in a sexual relationship with the patient, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries including in her conduct and communications, and inappropriately administering medication and/or other substances and/or inappropriately providing the patient with medication and/or other substances, and having the patient inappropriately administer medication and/or substances to her.  In addition, it is also alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to patients including by, but not limited to, failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients, including in her conduct and communications, inappropriately administering medications and/or other substances to patients, and inappropriately disclosing personal health information. In addition, it is also alleged that Dr. Khulbe engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including, but not limited to, by failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients including by hosting social gatherings and/or parties at her medical practice, that patients attended; consuming alcohol with and/or in the presence of patients; and inappropriately administering medication and/or other substances to others and to herself and/or having others inappropriately administer to her.    
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2000