THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:40:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI, FARSI, PERSIAN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1505- HURONTARIO STREET
MISSISSAUGA ON L5G 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-232-1007
Fax: 905-990-7999
Address: Trillium Health Partners , M site
100 Queensway street west
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487557
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Feb 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asady Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asady (CPSO#: 75456 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga Site
Dept of Paediatric/ Neonatology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 484-7557
Business Address: Suite 102
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1N1
(905) 252-1007
Business Address: 1505-Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G3H7
9052321007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DARI, FARSI, PERSIAN, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1505- HURONTARIO STREET
MISSISSAUGA ON L5G 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-232-1007
Fax: 905-990-7999
Address: Trillium Health Partners , M site
100 Queensway street west
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487557
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Feb 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asady Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asady (CPSO#: 75456 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga Site
Dept of Paediatric/ Neonatology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 484-7557
Business Address: Suite 102
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1N1
(905) 252-1007
Business Address: 1505-Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G3H7
9052321007

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mohammad Anwar Asady may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics and
Neonatology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mohammad Anwar Asady may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics and
Neonatology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2000