THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240-3100 Boul De La Côte-Vertu
Saint-Laurent QC H4R 2J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-819-1015
Fax: 514-819-1016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moreno Morelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Jan 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240-3100 Boul De La Côte-Vertu
Saint-Laurent QC H4R 2J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-819-1015
Fax: 514-819-1016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moreno Morelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Jan 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORENO MORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORENO MORELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2000