THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: East End Community Health Centre
1619 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 778-5858
Fax: (416) 778-5855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: East End Community Health Centre
1619 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 778-5858
Fax: (416) 778-5855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2000