THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 370 Elmwood dr.
Moncton New Brunswick E1A 8R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545
Address: 100 Maurice Crescent
Dieppe New Brunswick E1A 8R2
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 370 Elmwood dr.
Moncton New Brunswick E1A 8R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545
Address: 100 Maurice Crescent
Dieppe New Brunswick E1A 8R2
Phone: 506 380-1921
Fax: 506 855-3545

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE DOUGLAS CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE DOUGLAS CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2000