THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 402
2039 Robertson road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 7965935
Fax: 3432700771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Jul 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 402
2039 Robertson road
Nepean Ontario K2H 8R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 7965935
Fax: 3432700771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Jul 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MARK PATRICK HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MARK PATRICK HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2000