THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:57:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: sexual health center
179 Clarence St
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 580-2424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: sexual health center
179 Clarence St
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 580-2424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAURA BAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAURA BAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2000