THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:56:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Room B6-106
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3593
Fax: (519) 663-3595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chu and Van Hooren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Room B6-106
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3593
Fax: (519) 663-3595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chu and Van Hooren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WAYNE ART CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WAYNE ART CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2000