THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Cornish Ave
Misericordia Hospital
2nd Floor Eye Clinic, Green Desk
Winnipeg Manitoba
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-788-8584
Fax: 204-789-9237
Address: 25 B Main St S
Kenora Ontario P9N 1S8
Phone: (807) 468-3649
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Cornish Ave
Misericordia Hospital
2nd Floor Eye Clinic, Green Desk
Winnipeg Manitoba
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-788-8584
Fax: 204-789-9237
Address: 25 B Main St S
Kenora Ontario P9N 1S8
Phone: (807) 468-3649
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK ALEXANDER STOCKL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOCKL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK ALEXANDER STOCKL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOCKL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2000