THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3080 Yonge Street
unit 4076
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-6644
Fax: (647) 347-6647
Address: 2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON L5K 2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-1310 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W6
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9600 bathurst st
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Phone: (416) 588-3788
Fax: (416) 588-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Apr 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Lashevsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, ITALIAN
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3080 Yonge Street
unit 4076
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-6644
Fax: (647) 347-6647
Address: 2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON L5K 2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-1310 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W6
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9600 bathurst st
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
Phone: (416) 588-3788
Fax: (416) 588-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Apr 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Lashevsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Apr 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 18 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Ilan Lashevsky may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Ilan Lashevsky may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2000