THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:31:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1994
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2000