THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
HHS - Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 67658
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 28 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
HHS - Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 67658
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 28 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL ELLIS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF ONCOLOGY, DIVISION OF MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. ELLIS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. ELLIS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL ELLIS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF ONCOLOGY, DIVISION OF MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. ELLIS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. ELLIS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2000