THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:29:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Manotick medical centre
Manotick
5230 mitch owens road
k4m1b2
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Manotick medical centre
Manotick
5230 mitch owens road
k4m1b2
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2000
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2000