THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:03:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jul 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Date Received: 29 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jul 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B4
Date Received: 29 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2001