THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: Tamir, Gabriela (Used Until: 14 Jul 2009)
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8200 Bayview Ave
Thornhill Ontario L3T 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-3212
Fax: (905) 881-3184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Tamir, Gabriela (Used Until: 14 Jul 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8200 Bayview Ave
Thornhill Ontario L3T 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-3212
Fax: (905) 881-3184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELA FRANKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELA FRANKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Aug 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Aug 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Jul 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Aug 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Aug 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Jul 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Apr 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 May 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2001