THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:54:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Infectious Diseases
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, Eaton Wing
Room 220
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3183
Fax: 416-340-3357

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Infectious Diseases
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, Eaton Wing
Room 220
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3183
Fax: 416-340-3357

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN FISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN FISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2001