THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:45:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166272116
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 255 Consumers Road
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M2J 1R3
Phone: 4164890711
Fax: 4164897009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 25 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166272116
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 255 Consumers Road
Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M2J 1R3
Phone: 4164890711
Fax: 4164897009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 25 May 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001