THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/04/25 03:32:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Park Place
231 Oak Park Boulevard, Suite 110
Oakville Ontario L6H 7S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corinne Breen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Park Place
231 Oak Park Boulevard, Suite 110
Oakville Ontario L6H 7S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corinne Breen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINNE HUBERTHA LIDWINA BREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINNE HUBERTHA LIDWINA BREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001