THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:08:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 605
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-8550
Fax: (905) 604-8552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 605
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-8550
Fax: (905) 604-8552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BONNIE FELICIA CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BONNIE FELICIA CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001