THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: River Medical Centre
677 Dundas Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Address: 1238 Queen St E
Avondale Retirement Home
Toronto ON M4L 1C3
Phone: 647 547 1812
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-589 king street east
corktown medical centre
Toronto Ontario M5A1M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vowinckel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: River Medical Centre
677 Dundas Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Address: 1238 Queen St E
Avondale Retirement Home
Toronto ON M4L 1C3
Phone: 647 547 1812
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-589 king street east
corktown medical centre
Toronto Ontario M5A1M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vowinckel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIKA ANN META VOWINCKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOWINCKEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIKA ANN META VOWINCKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOWINCKEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001