THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:05:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Prychitko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Prychitko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN TERRY PHILIP PRYCHITKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRYCHITKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN TERRY PHILIP PRYCHITKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRYCHITKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001