THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:34:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 945-1550
Fax: (613) 945-1555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen L. Stoddart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 945-1550
Fax: (613) 945-1555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen L. Stoddart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LEIGH STODDART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STODDART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LEIGH STODDART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STODDART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001