THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:22:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 09 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saltel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 May 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 09 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus, 1053 Carling Avenue, Ottawa, ON, K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saltel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 May 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001