THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dennis, Melissa Robyn (Used Until: 28 Feb 2002)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1685 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472595112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416 314 4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Dennis, Melissa Robyn (Used Until: 28 Feb 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1685 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472595112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 25 Morton Shulman Ave
North York ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416 314 4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA ROBYN FELDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA ROBYN FELDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001