THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit B
475 Millidge Avenue
Saint John New Brunswick E2K 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5066580029
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit B
475 Millidge Avenue
Saint John New Brunswick E2K 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5066580029
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATYENDRA SATYANARAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATYANARAYANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATYENDRA SATYANARAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATYANARAYANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001