THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-256-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Teal Umbrella
Family Dental Healthcare
200-1580 Merivale Road
Nepean Ontario K2G 4B5
Phone: 613-216-9296
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-256-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Teal Umbrella
Family Dental Healthcare
200-1580 Merivale Road
Nepean Ontario K2G 4B5
Phone: 613-216-9296
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH RACHEL SIMKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH RACHEL SIMKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001