THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:08:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. J. Nijmeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nijmeh (CPSO#: 76459 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 1615 Dundas Street East
Suite 17X
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. J. Nijmeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nijmeh (CPSO#: 76459 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 1615 Dundas Street East
Suite 17X
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARRY JOHN NIJMEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJMEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARRY JOHN NIJMEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJMEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001