THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:45:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-2516
Fax: (613) 738-4854

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Jan 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Jan 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolina Jimenez Rivera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-2516
Fax: (613) 738-4854

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Jan 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Jan 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolina Jimenez Rivera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Nov 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 20 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Carolina de los Angeles Jimenez Rivera may practise medicine independently in paediatric
gastroenterology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Carolina de los Angeles Jimenez Rivera may practise medicine independently in paediatric
gastroenterology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2001
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2001